Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3441 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16847 Week
» 69863 Month
» 189390 Year
» 3216243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3989 |
03/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08821 |
07/09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3989 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
07/09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08821 |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08821 from Laira (LA) |
|
|
19/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|