Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 856 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24487 Week
» 89441 Month
» 292105 Year
» 3318958 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3984 |
05/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08816 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
06/08/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/08/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/08/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1976 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/08/1976 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3984 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08816 |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WS) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
06/08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
22/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
04/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
01/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08816 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
08/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Wabtec: Doncaster Works |
|
|