Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18170 Week
» 71186 Month
» 190713 Year
» 3217566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3982 |
25/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08814 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1976 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3982 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08814 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (HD) |
|
|
20/11/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08814 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|