Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19236 Week
» 72252 Month
» 191779 Year
» 3218632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3977 |
09/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08809 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1972 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3977 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08809 |
|
|
01/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08809 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|