Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 69898 Month
» 189425 Year
» 3216278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3971 |
18/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08803 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3971 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08803 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08803 from Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|