Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2712 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16118 Week
» 69134 Month
» 188661 Year
» 3215514 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3969 |
11/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08801 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3969 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08801 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
31/01/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08801 |
|
|
03/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|