Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1679 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15085 Week
» 68101 Month
» 187628 Year
» 3214481 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3968 |
04/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08800 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3968 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08800 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
25/01/1993 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
07/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|