Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2181 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19984 Week
» 73000 Month
» 192527 Year
» 3219380 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3965 |
28/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08797 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3965 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08797 |
|
|
12/11/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08797 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
10/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|