Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1311 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19114 Week
» 72130 Month
» 191657 Year
» 3218510 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3963 |
21/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08795 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3963 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08795 |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
25/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|