Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18969 Week
» 71985 Month
» 191512 Year
» 3218365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3956 |
07/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08788 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
07/05/1960 to Old Oak Common (81A) |
Withdrawn |
14/01/1994 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3956 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
05/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (2H) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08788 |
|
|
24/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
14/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|