Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 3982 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13556 Week
» 78510 Month
» 281174 Year
» 3308027 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3953 |
23/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08785 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/08/1981 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/08/1981 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/08/1981 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
02/08/1981 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3953 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08785 |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|