Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1073 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6857 Week
» 28246 Month
» 147773 Year
» 3174626 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3940 |
16/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08772 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
16/03/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
14/01/1994 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow ends, black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3940 Built at Derby Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow ends, black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08772 |
|
|
15/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Darlington) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
14/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|