Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4472 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 25506 Week
» 124151 Month
» 326815 Year
» 3353668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D394 |
13/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40194 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
13/06/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
23/01/1985 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 02/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements, |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
13/06/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/12/1969 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D394 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
29/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40194 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
23/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40194 |
|
|
02/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|