Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 722 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14128 Week
» 67144 Month
» 186671 Year
» 3213524 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3939 |
10/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08771 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/03/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3939 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Consett (52K) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08771 |
|
|
01/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
22/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
20/03/1992 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
30/09/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|