Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 607 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6391 Week
» 27780 Month
» 147307 Year
» 3174160 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3932 |
17/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08764 |
11/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3932 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
21/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08764 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
06/05/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08764 from Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
07/1988 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|