Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1502 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14908 Week
» 67924 Month
» 187451 Year
» 3214304 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3930 |
06/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08762 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3930 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08762 |
|
|