Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 662 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14068 Week
» 67084 Month
» 186611 Year
» 3213464 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3923 |
20/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08755 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/01/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3923 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08755 |
|
|
04/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
10/09/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08755 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
09/06/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|