Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 558 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18361 Week
» 71377 Month
» 190904 Year
» 3217757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3918 |
20/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08750 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/07/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/07/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3918 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08750 |
|
|