Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18847 Week
» 71863 Month
» 191390 Year
» 3218243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3917 |
12/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08749 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (09/1) |
09104 |
05/01/1993 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 08 | 12/12/1960 | 09/1 | 05/01/1993 |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
12/12/1960 to Polmadie (66A) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3917 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
22/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08749 |
|
|
05/01/1993 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09104 |
|
|