Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2679 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13894 Week
» 4950 Month
» 351374 Year
» 3378227 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3916 |
10/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08748 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
10/12/1960 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/1994 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
on 10/02/1997 |
Cut At |
Birds (at Ipswich MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3916 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08748 |
|
|
21/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
10/02/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: at Ipswich MPD |
|
|