Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 621 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19532 Week
» 84486 Month
» 287150 Year
» 3314003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3915 |
02/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08747 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3915 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08747 |
|
|
11/07/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08747 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|