Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3911 |
09/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08743 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
09/11/1960 to Polmadie (66A) |
Withdrawn |
03/03/1993 off Neville Hill (NL) |
Time in Service |
32 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
22/11/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3911 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
26/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08743 |
|
|
03/03/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08743 from Neville Hill (NL) |
|
|