Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 5134 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20746 Week
» 119391 Month
» 322055 Year
» 3348908 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3910 |
01/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08742 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
01/11/1960 to Polmadie (66A) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/08/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/08/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3910 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
29/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
10/08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08742 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|