Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1847 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15253 Week
» 68269 Month
» 187796 Year
» 3214649 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3880 |
29/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08713 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3880 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08713 |
|
|
26/06/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08713 |
|
|
14/06/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|