Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4388 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17794 Week
» 70810 Month
» 190337 Year
» 3217190 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3879 |
28/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08712 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/04/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3879 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (GM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08712 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08712 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
15/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: at Motherwell MPD |
|
|