Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3519 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16925 Week
» 69941 Month
» 189468 Year
» 3216321 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3875 |
26/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08708 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3875 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08708 |
|
|
09/10/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08708 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|