Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3874 |
19/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08707 |
07/12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3874 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
07/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08707 |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08707 from Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
28/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|