Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1763 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15169 Week
» 68185 Month
» 187712 Year
» 3214565 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3870 |
17/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08703 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
17/02/1960 to Stoke (5D) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1974 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3870 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08703 |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
19/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|