Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3739 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13313 Week
» 78267 Month
» 280931 Year
» 3307784 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3869 |
12/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08702 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3869 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
04/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08702 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
02/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|
28/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08702 |
|
|