Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1573 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7357 Week
» 28746 Month
» 148273 Year
» 3175126 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3867 |
20/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08700 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
20/01/1960 to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
Withdrawn |
29/06/2001 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
07/2004 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/01/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
07/1976 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3867 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08700 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
29/06/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08700 |
|
|
07/2004 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|