Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3576 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16982 Week
» 69998 Month
» 189525 Year
» 3216378 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3865 |
19/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08698 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3865 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
20/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08698 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08698 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|