Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14981 Week
» 67997 Month
» 187524 Year
» 3214377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3852 |
19/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08685 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3852 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08685 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NC) |
|
|