Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 276 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6060 Week
» 27449 Month
» 146976 Year
» 3173829 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3845 |
01/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08678 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1974 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1974 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3845 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08678 |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
21/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
30/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08678 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|