Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3844 |
11/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08677 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3844 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08677 |
|
|
10/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08677 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
06/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|