Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3843 |
04/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08676 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3843 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08676 |
|
|