Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1886 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19689 Week
» 72705 Month
» 192232 Year
» 3219085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3839 |
02/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08672 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3839 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08672 |
|
|
21/09/1992 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
15/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|