Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17410 Week
» 70426 Month
» 189953 Year
» 3216806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3836 |
02/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08669 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3836 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08669 |
|
|
23/05/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08669 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|