Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19139 Week
» 72155 Month
» 191682 Year
» 3218535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3830 |
05/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08663 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1981 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3830 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08663 |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
12/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/09/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (BZ) |
|
|