Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17235 Week
» 70251 Month
» 189778 Year
» 3216631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3826 |
13/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08659 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3826 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08659 |
|
|
24/06/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08659 from Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
03/03/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|