Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1156 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20067 Week
» 85021 Month
» 287685 Year
» 3314538 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3825 |
05/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08658 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3825 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08658 |
|
|
05/02/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08658 from Norwich Thorpe (NC) |
|
|
14/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|