Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 807 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6591 Week
» 27980 Month
» 147507 Year
» 3174360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3817 |
18/03/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08650 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/03/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3817 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
27/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08650 |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
01/08/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08650 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|