Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 249 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6033 Week
» 27422 Month
» 146949 Year
» 3173802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3810 |
30/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08643 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
30/01/1959 to Newport Pill (86B) |
Withdrawn |
2001 |
Time in Service |
41 yrs , 10 mths |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1980 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
02/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
12/02/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3810 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08643 |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
28/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
01/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) |
|
|
02/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08643 |
|
|