Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 342 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18145 Week
» 71161 Month
» 190688 Year
» 3217541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3807 |
29/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08640 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3807 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OX) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08640 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
14/11/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08640 from Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
29/03/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|