Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3491 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16897 Week
» 69913 Month
» 189440 Year
» 3216293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3806 |
23/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08639 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3806 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08639 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
30/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08639 from Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|