Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 496 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 27669 Month
» 147196 Year
» 3174049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3795 |
21/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08628 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
21/11/1959 to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
Withdrawn |
12/10/1981 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1973 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1973 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3795 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
24/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08628 |
|
|
12/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08628 |
|
|