Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1156 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14562 Week
» 67578 Month
» 187105 Year
» 3213958 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3782 |
05/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08615 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
05/09/1959 to Rose Grove (24B) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1993 off Allerton (AN) |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3782 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08615 |
|
|
01/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08615 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|