Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17806 Week
» 70822 Month
» 190349 Year
» 3217202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3780 |
22/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08613 |
09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
22/08/1959 to Lower Darwen (24D) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/1993 |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1972 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3780 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (21F) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08613 |
|
|
01/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|