Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1308 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14714 Week
» 67730 Month
» 187257 Year
» 3214110 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3772 |
13/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08605 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3772 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08605 |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (DY) |
|
|