Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 559 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6343 Week
» 27732 Month
» 147259 Year
» 3174112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3769 |
30/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08602 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3769 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08602 |
|
|
30/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08602 from Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|