Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1557 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7341 Week
» 28730 Month
» 148257 Year
» 3175110 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3765 |
02/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08598 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3765 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08598 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (DY) |
|
|
10/11/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08598 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|